1149
Q:

In an election between two candidates, one got 55% of the total valid votes, 20% of the votes were invalid. If the total number of votes was 7500, the number of valid votes that the other candidate got, was :

A) 2500 B) 2700
C) 2900 D) 3100

Answer:   B) 2700



Explanation:

Total number of votes = 7500 

Given that 20% of Percentage votes were invalid

 => Valid votes = 80%

 Total valid votes = 7500*(80/100) 

1st candidate got 55% of the total valid votes. 

Hence the 2nd candidate should have got 45% of the total valid votes 

=> Valid votes that 2nd candidate got = total valid votes x (45/100) 

7500*(80/100)*(45/100) = 2700

Q:

If P is 140, which is 40% more than Q, then 3/25 of Q is

A) 9 B) 12
C) 18 D) 24
 
Answer & Explanation Answer: B) 12

Explanation:

From the given data,

P = 140

But it is given that,

40% of Q + Q = 140 = P

=> Q + [40Q/100] = 140

=> [100Q + 40Q]/100 = 140

=> 140Q = 140 x 100

=> Q = 100

Now,

 3/25 of Q 

= (3/25) x 100

= 3 x 4 

= 12 

 

Required 3/25 of Q  = 12.

Report Error

View Answer Workspace Report Error Discuss

13 610
Q:

When the price of rice decrease by 10%, a girl could buy 1 kg more for Rs. 270. Then, the original price of the rice per kg is

A) Rs. 36 B) Rs. 30
C) Rs. 28 D) Rs. 40
 
Answer & Explanation Answer: B) Rs. 30

Explanation:

From the given data,

When the price of rice is decreased by 10%, the value of Rs. 270 would become

270 x 100/90 = 300

Now, the value 270 becomes 300

And given, the girl could buy 1 kg extra for that value

Change in value = 300 - 270 = Rs. 30

 

Therefore, 1 kg extra rice she can get for Rs. 30

 

=> The original price of rice = Rs. 30/kg.

 

As she gets only 9 kgs for Rs. 270 before 10% discount, now after discount she gets 10 kgs instead of 9 kgs for Rs. 270.  

Report Error

View Answer Workspace Report Error Discuss

20 1126
Q:

5% of 400000?

A) 4000 B) 16000
C) 8000 D) 20000
 
Answer & Explanation Answer: D) 20000

Explanation:

5% of 400000

= 5 x 400000/100

= 20,000

 

Hence, 5% of 4,00,000 = 20,000

Report Error

View Answer Workspace Report Error Discuss

12 589
Q:

Solve 30 + (.0825 x 30) + (15% x 30)

A) 24.750 B) 36.975
C) 34.652 D) 26.354
 
Answer & Explanation Answer: B) 36.975

Explanation:

30 + (.0825 x 30) + (15% x 30)

 

Now

=> 0.0825 x 30 = 2.475 -----(1)

=> 15% of 30 = 450/100 = 4.5 -----(2) 

 

Hence, from (1) & (2)

30 + (.0825 x 30) + (15% x 30)

= 30 + 2.475 + 4.5

30 + (.0825 x 30) + (15% x 30) = 36.975.

Report Error

View Answer Workspace Report Error Discuss

12 1120
Q:

15% of 32 is

A) 3.6 B) 4.8
C) 5.2 D) 5.8
 
Answer & Explanation Answer: B) 4.8

Explanation:

15% of 32 is 

15 x 32/100 = 4.8.

 

Report Error

View Answer Workspace Report Error Discuss

17 786
Q:

A restaurant offers a new promotion of 20% off the original price of cakes, which is Rs. 12. Before the promotion 250 cakes were sold each day. After the promotion, the sale of cakes increases an average of 18% more per day. How much more or less does the restaurant make each day in cakes sales after the promotion?

A) Rs. 185 less B) Rs. 202 more
C) Rs. 175 more D) Rs. 168 less
 
Answer & Explanation Answer: D) Rs. 168 less

Explanation:

Cost of each cake P1 & P2 = Rs. 12

Offer decrease in % = 20%

Increase in sale per day (Q2) = 250 - 18%

Total quantity per day (Q1) = 250

Hence, required change total revenue

TR = P2Q2 - P1Q1 = (12 x 0.8 x 250 x 1.18) -  (12 x 250) = - Rs.168.

Report Error

View Answer Workspace Report Error Discuss

12 1529
Q:

One hour is what percent of a day?

A) 5.6% B) 4.16%
C) 3.35% D) 6.7%
 
Answer & Explanation Answer: B) 4.16%

Explanation:

A day has 24 hrs

=> If 24 hrs - 100

Then 1 hr = ?

100/24 = 4.16%

Report Error

View Answer Workspace Report Error Discuss

15 1440
Q:

In a class of 80 students and 5 teachers, each student got sweets that are 15% of the total number of students and each teacher got sweets that are 25% of the total number of students. How many sweets were there?

A) 1060 B) 960
C) 1020 D) 920
 
Answer & Explanation Answer: A) 1060

Explanation:

Total number of sweets

= 80 x 15 x 80/100 + 5 x 80 x 25/100

= 960 + 100 = 1060

Report Error

View Answer Workspace Report Error Discuss

21 1356